IL HB1870 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code in the Article concerning the Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association. Makes changes in the provisions concerning coverage and limitations; definitions; Board of Directors of the Association; powers and duties of the Association; assessments; and miscellaneous provisions.
Title
INS CD-GUARANTY ASSOCIATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-11-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2011-07-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-18 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-18 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2011-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2011-05-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2011 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2011 |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 011-000-000 |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2011-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(c-1) - Referred to Insurance |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2011-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 531.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 531.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |