IL HB1852 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that public funds may not be expended by a non-home rule municipality for registration fees to attend or participate in a convention or gathering of municipal personnel. Provides that a State agency may not expend public funds for expenses connected with the renting or procurement of hospitality suites or other fully-enclosed physical spaces at a convention or gathering of municipal personnel. Provides that a "convention or gathering of municipal personnel" means a gathering of employees or contractors from 2 or more separately domiciled or geographically separated municipalities in a gathering that is sponsored or co-sponsored by a league or association that includes 2 or more municipalities. Provides that the restrictions do not apply to public funds expended at a convention or gathering of public safety personnel, at a convention or gathering of non-home rule municipal personnel relating to economic development and tourism promotion, pursuant to a contract entered into before the effective date of the amendatory Act, or funds appropriated and expended by a non-home rule municipality if specified procedures are followed. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNICIPAL CONVENTION EXPENSES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1852&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB1852.htm |