IL HB1826 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987. Provides that a physician licensed to practice medicine in all its branches may collaborate with a physician assistant if specified requirements are met for a collaborative agreement. Provides that a collaborative agreement shall be for services in the same area of practice or specialty as the collaborating physician in his or her clinical medical practice. Amends the Physician Assistant Practice Act of 1987. Deletes language requiring a collaborative agreement to be written for a physician assistant and changes requirements for the collaborative agreement. Provides that medical care provided by a physician assistant shall be consistent with the physician assistant's education, training, and experience. Makes changes to provisions concerning prescriptive authority of a physician assistant. Provides that in a hospital, hospital affiliate, or ambulatory surgical treatment center, the medical staff (instead of the attending physician) shall determine a physician assistant's role in providing care for patients. Changes the physician assistant advisory committee to the Physician Assistant Medical Licensing Board. Changes the membership and duties of the Board. Removes provisions concerning initial terms of office for Board members. Makes conforming and other changes. Effective January 1, 2022.
Title
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 60 | 54.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 7.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1826&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB1826.htm |