IL HB1816 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
TRANSPORTATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law; Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2013-05-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 23, 2013 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2013-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-001-000 |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-04-17 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary; 015-000-000 |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2013-04-05 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |