IL HB1804 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Allows a motion to be filed with the trial court that entered the judgment of conviction in a defendant's case at any time following the entry of a guilty verdict or a finding of guilt for any offense under the Criminal Code of 1961 or the Criminal Code of 2012 or a similar local ordinance by the defendant provided: (1) the motion clearly states the penalty for the offense for which the defendant was found guilty or convicted has been amended or changed and became effective after his or her plea of guilty or conviction, which includes but is not limited to: (A) reduces the minimum or maximum sentence for the offense; (B) grants the court more discretion over the range of penalties for the offense; (C) the underlying conduct relating to the offense was decriminalized; or (D) other instances in which the penalties associated with the offense or conduct underlying the offense were reduced in any way; and (2) reasonable notice of the motion is served upon the State. If the court grants a motion under this Section, it must reduce the penalty imposed on the defendant so that it is consistent with the penalty the defendant would have received if the current law was in effect on the date when the offense was committed and the court may take any additional action it deems appropriate under the circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO - RESENTENCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-05-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-03SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-06SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-06SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-041-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-03-14HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-03-10HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-07HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-07HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-22HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255116-2.2New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback