IL HB1803 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a provision requiring the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to determine the quantity and quality of medical services provided under the State's Medical Assistance program, provides that such services may include dental and periodontal prevention and treatment services for residents of long term care facilities and adults diagnosed with a developmental disability or an acquired disability that is permanent and irreversible and that occurred prior to age 21. Provides that on or after July 1, 2017, the Department shall provide dental services, including periodontal prevention and treatment and prescription eyeglasses to veterans and their dependents. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-DENTAL SERVICES-VETS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-09HouseTo Medicaid Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2017-02-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback