IL HB1797 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the Parental Notice of Abortion Act of 1995. Makes corresponding changes in the Counties Code, the Medical Practice Act of 1987, and the Consent by Minors to Medical Procedures Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PARENT NOTICE ABORTION-REPEAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2021-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2021-04-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2021-04-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2021-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2021-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2021-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
2021-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-09HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2021-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris
2021-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
2021-02-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-02-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2021-02-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-17HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2256022Amended CodeCitation Text
2256023Amended CodeCitation Text
4102101.5Amended CodeCitation Text
5553-4006Amended CodeCitation Text
75070ActRepealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback