IL HB1797 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on November 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0546
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Capital Development Board Act. Provides that, for certain contracts entered into between the Capital Development Board and a regional port district concerning an appropriation for cargo handling facilities, if, for a period of 25 years, the regional port district has not been required to remit any amount of the appropriation to the State because the regional port district has failed to achieve the required level of profit, then the regional port district shall not be required to remit any amount of the appropriation under the contract. Provides a preamble. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CDB-IL INTL PORT DISTRICT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-08 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - Motion in House (Y: 79 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-09HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0546
2017-11-09HouseEffective Date November 8, 2017
2017-11-08HouseBoth Houses Override Total Veto
2017-11-08SenateOverride Governor Veto - Senate Passed 039-008-000
2017-11-08Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-11-07SenateMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-11-01SenatePlaced Calendar Total Veto
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-10-25HouseOverride Governor Veto - House Passed 079-036-000
2017-10-25House3/5 Vote Required
2017-10-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-10-12HouseMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. William Davis
2017-10-12HousePlaced on Calendar Total Veto
2017-08-25HouseGovernor Vetoed
2017-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 036-012-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2017
2017-05-24SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-19SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateDo Pass State Government; 005-002-000
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-11SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-03-30SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-03-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 14, 2017
2017-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-039-000
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee; 011-005-000
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee
2017-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20310513Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1797&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1797.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1797eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1797enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB1797gms.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0546.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB1797_03092017_008000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB1797_05302017_018000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB1797_10252017_013000M.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB1797_11082017_003000M.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback