IL HB1790 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that no State agency subject to the provisions of the Code shall enter into a contract with a business, person, or other entity that has been found to have committed insurrection or advocated the overthrow of the federal or State government. Requires units of local government to adopt an ordinance or resolution that regulates contracts between those units of local government and businesses, persons, or other entities that have been found to have committed insurrection or advocated the overthrow of the federal or State government. Provides that a business, person, or entity is found to have committed insurrection or advocated the overthrow of the federal or State government if such business, person, or entity is found guilty under specified provisions.
Title
STATE CONTRACTS-INSURRECTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1790&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB1790.htm |