IL HB1774 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-11)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides for the election of the Chicago Board of Education starting with the 2019 consolidated election. Makes related changes. Amends the Chicago School District Article of the School Code. Provides that a person shall be a U.S. citizen and registered voter and shall have been a resident of the city and the electoral district for at least one year immediately preceding his or her election. Sets forth provisions concerning nominating petitions and ballots. Sets forth provisions providing that the City of Chicago shall be subdivided into 20 electoral districts by the General Assembly for seats on the Chicago Board of Education. Sets forth provisions providing that in the year following each decennial census, the General Assembly shall redistrict the electoral districts to reflect the results of each decennial census. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELECTED CHICAGO SCHOOL BOARD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-001-000
2017-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1052A-1.2Amended CodeCitation Text
1052A-48Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-13.1Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-21.9New CodeSee Bill Text
105534-3Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-4Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-4.1New CodeSee Bill Text
105534-4.2New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback