IL HB1763 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that, beginning with the next registration year after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Secretary of State shall issue one registration plate (instead of 2 registration plates) for newly registered motor vehicles and the registration plate shall be attached to the rear (instead of the front and rear) of the motor vehicle.
Title
VEH CD-ONE LICENSE PLATE
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Jacobs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | To Transportation Issues Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Paul Jacobs |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-171 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-412 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-413 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1763&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB1763.htm |