IL HB1743 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 013-000-000 |
2020-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Remains in Executive Committee |
2020-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Executive Committee; 005-006-000 |
2020-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chris Miller |
2020-05-21 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Chris Miller |
2020-05-20 | House | Legislation Considered in Special Session No. 1 |
2020-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-05-18 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate *** |
2019-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate *** |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 1-1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |