IL HB1733 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Car Seat Recycling Act. Provides that manufacturers shall accept car seats for the purpose of recycling the material from the car seats. Requires manufacturers to dismantle a car seat if received intact and accept the dismantled materials from car seats. Provides that each manufacturer shall begin implementation of its recycling program within one year of the effective date of the Act. Contains requirements for the recycling program. Effective January 1, 2023.
Title
CAR SEAT RECYCLING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1733&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB1733.htm |