IL HB1727 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Bad Apples in Law Enforcement Accountability Act of 2021. Provides that a peace officer subjecting another person to the deprivation of individual rights is liable to the person for appropriate relief. Excludes sovereign immunity, statutory immunity, and statutory damages for claims brought under this provision. Provides that qualified immunity is not a defense to liability under this provision. Allows attorney's fees and costs to be awarded to the plaintiff. Provides that civil actions brought under this provision must be commenced within 5 years after the cause of action accrues. Requires units of local government to make public disclosures regarding judgments or settlements awarded under this provision. Determines what information is not required to be disclosed by the unit of local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OFFICER ACCOUNTABILITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-23HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-21HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2021-04-20HouseFiscal Note Filed
2021-04-15HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Blaine Wilhour
2021-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2021-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2021-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2021-04-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2021-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2021-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-04-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-03-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 004-002-000
2021-03-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2021-03-16HouseRe-assigned to Restorative Justice Committee
2021-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
2021-03-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2021-03-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2021-02-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-17HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback