IL HB1726 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Restricts participation in the General Assembly Retirement System to persons who were participants in the System before the effective date of the amendatory Act. Requires a person who becomes a constitutional officer or member of the General Assembly on or after that date to participate in the State Employees' Retirement System. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-GARS-NO NEW MEMBERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-04-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-30 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2011-03-30 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2011-03-29 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 005-001-003 |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith Farnham |