IL HB1709 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0230
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0230
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Sacia [R] | Sen. Tim Bivins [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0230 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2013 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 23, 2013 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-005-001 |
2013-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-000-000 |
2013-03-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-15 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-03-07 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jim Sacia |
2013-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Sacia |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 1-1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |