IL HB1675 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Uniform Military and Overseas Voters Act, promulgated by the National Conference of Commissioners on Uniform State Laws. Amends the Election Code to make it subject to the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
UNIFORM ACT-MILITARY VOTE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1675&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB1675.htm |