IL HB1647 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that, beginning on January 1, 2024, the exemption for farm machinery and equipment also includes electrical power generation equipment used primarily for production agriculture. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TAX-POWER GENERATION
Sponsors
Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] | Rep. Harry Benton [D] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] |
Rep. Jason Bunting [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2023-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2023-02-23 | House | To Revenue - Sales, Amusement and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr. |
2023-02-15 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1647&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1647.htm |