IL HB1630 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. Allows the Board of Trustees of Community College District No. 506 to establish and offer at Sauk Valley Community College a baccalaureate-level nursing education pilot program that confers a bachelor of science degree in nursing upon the meeting of specified conditions. Requires the Illinois Community College Board to conduct a statewide evaluation of the nursing program and report on the results of the evaluation by July 1, 2028; specifies evaluation requirements. Effective immediately.
Title
NURSING DEGREE PILOT PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-01-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2023-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bradley Fritts |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1630&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1630.htm |