IL HB1624 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Police Training Act to provide that the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board may offer a school resource officer course to a qualified retired law enforcement officer. Provides that nothing in the school resource officer course provision prohibits a school resource officer or qualified retired law enforcement officer from carrying a firearm. Amends the School Code. Provides that beginning January 1, 2024, a school or school district may employ a qualified retired law enforcement officer who obtains a certificate of completion or approved waiver under the Illinois Police Training Act to carry out the duties of a school resource officer. Makes a conforming change. Effective immediately.
Title
SCHOOL RESOURCE OFFICERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | To Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.68 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 705 | 10.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1624&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1624.htm |