IL HB1594 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit for an Illinois business that increases its average full-time employee head count in the State for the taxable year by more than 20% over its average full-time employee head count in the State for the immediately preceding taxable year. Provides that the amount of the credit is 20% of its tax liability under this Act (other than its withholding tax liability) for the taxable year. Provides that the credit is exempt from the Act's automatic sunset provision. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-HEAD COUNT CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-08-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-08-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-07-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-07-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-07-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-07-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-07-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-07-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-06-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2019-06-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-06-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-06-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-06-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-06-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1594&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1594.htm |