IL HB1575 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that, beginning on July 1, 2023, the rate of tax shall be $0.19 per gallon (currently, 39.2 cents per gallon, adjusted each year according to the percentage increase in the Consumer Price Index), plus an additional 2 1/2 cents per gallon for diesel fuel, liquefied natural gas, or propane. Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that no tax may be imposed under the Municipal Motor Fuel Tax Law on or after July 1, 2023. Preempts the exercise of home rule powers. Effective immediately.
Title
MOTOR FUEL TAX-RATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam M. Niemerg |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 505 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-2.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1575&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1575.htm |