IL HB1540 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that nursing homes shall be designated as grace period registration sites for nursing home residents. In counties with less than 500,000 inhabitants, provides that nursing homes shall be designated as grace period registration sites for nursing home residents and employees. Provides that nursing home residents who register or change their address during the grace period shall be permitted to vote during the regular nursing home voting period and shall not be required to have submitted an absentee ballot request in advance. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-NURSING HOMES-GRACE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 4-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 5-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 6-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |