IL HB1519 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Student Loan Servicing Rights Act. Creates the Educational Income Share Agreements Article of the Student Loan Servicing Rights Act. Defines terms. Regarding income share agreements, sets forth provisions concerning monthly payment affordability, maximum effective annual percentage rate, Limits on duration of income share agreements, risk sharing, limits on covered income, fees permitted, restrictions on security interests, discharge of obligations, prohibitions on co-signers, limits on acceleration, assignment of wages, limitations on garnishment, use of multiple agreements, required disclosures, early completion of the agreement, assumption of increase in future income, receipts, adjustment of dollar amounts. Provides that the Attorney General may enforce a violation of the Educational Income Share Agreements Article of the Student Loan Servicing Rights Act as an unlawful practice under the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Makes other changes. Amends the Consumer Installment Loan Act and the Interest Act to make conforming changes. Provides that the provisions of the amendatory Act are severable. Effective immediately.
Title
CONSUMER INCOME SHARE ACT
Sponsors
Rep. Maurice West [D] | Rep. Dagmara Avelar [D] | Rep. Nicholas Smith [D] | Rep. Kevin Olickal [D] |
Rep. Edgar Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Travis Weaver [R] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 6, 2023 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2023-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2023-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2023-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2023-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee; 012-000-000 |
2023-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee; 012-000-000 |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-02-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee; 008-004-000 |
2023-02-15 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |