IL HB1518 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0481
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0481
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Senior Citizens Real Estate Tax Deferral Act. Beginning in tax year 2012, increases the taxpayer's income limit from $50,000 to $55,000. Provides that "qualified property" must not be held in trust, other than an Illinois land trust with the taxpayer identified as the sole beneficiary, if the taxpayer is filing for the program for the first time effective as of the January 1, 2011 assessment year or tax year 2012 and thereafter. Effective as of the January 1, 2011 assessment year or tax year 2012 and thereafter, provides that the total amount of any deferral shall not exceed $5,000 per taxpayer in each tax year. Effective immediately.
Title
SENIOR TAX DEFERRAL-INCOME
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0481 |
2011-08-22 | House | Effective Date August 22, 2011 |
2011-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2011-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2011-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000; MOTION #1 |
2011-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee; MOTION #1 |
2011-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie; MOTION #2 |
2011-05-17 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee; MOTION #1 |
2011-05-17 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie; MOTION #1 |
2011-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2011-05-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2011 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 010-000-000 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 7, 2011 |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2011-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2011-03-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2011-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-30 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000 |
2011-03-03 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-03-03 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 003-000-000 |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 30 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
320 | 30 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |