IL HB1516 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Firefighter Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that the Retirement Systems Reciprocal Act (Article 20 of the Code) is adopted and made a part of the Chicago Firefighter Article, but only with respect to a person who, on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, is entitled under the Chicago Firefighter Article to begin receiving a retirement annuity or survivor's annuity and who elects to proceed under the Retirement Systems Reciprocal Act. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement by the State.
Title
PEN CD-CHI FIRE-RECIPROCAL ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.47 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 6-235 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1516&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1516.htm |