IL HB1486 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0394
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0394
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that the Department of Revenue may grant waivers from the requirement that importing distributors to keep records at their licensed address or place of business, and permit importing distributors to keep those records at a central business location within the State. Effective immediately.
Title
IMPORTING DISTRIBUTOR-WAIVER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0394 |
2013-08-16 | House | Effective Date August 16, 2013 |
2013-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-22 | House | House Concurs |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-000-000 |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 010-000-000 |
2013-05-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2013-05-16 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-16 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2013-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2013-05-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2013 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 015-000-000 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2013-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-02-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 8-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |