IL HB1484 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0371
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0371
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act. Provides that a photograph is not required on an Illinois Identification Card or an Illinois Disabled Person Identification Card if the applicant is prohibited by bona fide religious convictions from being photographed. Requires that the Secretary of State determine by rule which religious orders and sects have bona fide religious convictions against a person being photographed.
Title
ID CARD-PHOTOGRAPH EXEMPTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0371 |
2011-08-15 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-08-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-18 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2011 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2011 |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-013-000 |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose |
2011-03-17 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Adam Brown |
2011-03-17 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2011-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2011-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose |
2011-02-15 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 335 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 335 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |