IL HB1479 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0576
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0576
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Department of Juvenile Justice.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0576 |
2018-01-16 | House | Effective Date June 1, 2018 |
2018-01-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-12-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-11-07 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 7, 2017 |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-06-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-06-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-001-000 |
2017-06-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-06-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-06-30 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-06-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-000-000 |
2017-06-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-06-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-06-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-06-28 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-04-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-2.5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |