IL HB1468 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-27 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Response) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-27 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Response) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the unlawful sale of public conveyance travel tickets to a minor.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-27 | House | Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto |
2018-05-16 | House | Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-16 | House | Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Filed Accept Amendatory Veto Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2018-05-14 | House | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2018-03-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-03-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 043-015-000 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-02-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-037-000 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-02-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000 |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-02-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-26 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-02-26 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-04-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 10-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |