IL HB1462 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0224
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0224
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Barriers Act. Provides that the accessibility standards that the Capital Development Board shall adopt and publish shall, to the greatest extent possible, incorporate by reference or be in concert with the 2010 ADA Standards for Accessible Design. Effective January 1, 2014.
Title
ACCESSIBILITY STANDARDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0224 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 010-000-000 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2013-03-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2013-03-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2013-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-03-07 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-06 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 020-000-000 |
2013-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2013-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2013-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2013-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2013-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-02-19 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol A. Sente |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 25 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |