IL HB1429 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Passed on August 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0428
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Passed on August 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0428
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that an otherwise qualified bidder or offeror who will fulfill the contract through the use of products made of recycled supplies shall (currently, may) be given a preference over bidders or offerors unable to do so, provided that the cost included in the bid of supplies is equal or less than other bids or offers. Effective immediately.
Title
PROCUREMENT CD-RECYCLED SUPPLY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-21 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0428 |
2015-08-21 | House | Effective Date August 21, 2015 |
2015-08-21 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2015 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 012-000-000 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2015-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2015-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2015-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2015-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 45-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |