IL HB1409 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Governor Transition Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the orderly transition of the office of Governor.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-01 | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-10-16 | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed | |
2009-10-16 | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed | |
2009-10-16 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-10-16 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-10-16 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 010-000-000 | |
2009-10-14 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-10-14 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-10-14 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee | |
2009-10-14 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-10-14 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-10-14 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-10-14 | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-10-14 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2009 | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** | |
2009-03-04 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000 | |
2009-03-03 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2009-03-03 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-02-19 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-17 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-02-17 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-02-17 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |