IL HB1390 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a period of probation, a term of periodic imprisonment, or conditional discharge shall not be imposed for a felony offense that requires registration under the Sex Offender Registration Act.
Title
NO PROBATION FOR SEX OFFENDERS
Sponsors
Rep. Jackie Haas [R] | Rep. Jeff Keicher [R] | Rep. Dennis Tipsword [R] | Rep. Kevin Schmidt [R] |
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2023-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jackie Haas |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1390&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1390.htm |