IL HB1389 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person also obstructs justice when, with intent to prevent the apprehension or obstruct the prosecution or defense of any person, he or she knowingly takes a body camera or any part of a body camera from a person known to be a peace officer. Provides that a violation, if the body camera or any part of the body camera is taken from the peace officer during the commission of an offense that has caused great bodily harm to the officer or another person, is a Class 1 felony. Provides that any other violation of this provision is a Class 2 felony.
Title
OBSTRUCT JUSTICE-BODY CAMERAS
Sponsors
Rep. Jackie Haas [R] | Rep. Patrick Sheehan [R] | Rep. Dennis Tipsword [R] | Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] |
Rep. Kevin Schmidt [R] | Rep. Martin McLaughlin [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2023-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2023-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2023-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jackie Haas |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 31-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1389&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1389.htm |