IL HB1383 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 028-083-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 028-083-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Industrial Hemp Act. Provides that any person desiring to grow, process, cultivate, harvest, process, possess, sell, or purchase industrial hemp or industrial hemp related products must be licensed by the Department of Agriculture. Provides that the application for a license shall include the name and address of the applicant and the legal description of the land area to be used to grow or process industrial hemp and that the license shall be valid for a period of one year. Requires an applicant to complete a statewide and nationwide criminal background check. Provides that no person with a prior felony conviction within 10 years of applying for a license shall be eligible for licensure. Preempts home rule.
Title
INDUSTRIAL HEMP ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 28 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 028-083-000 |
2011-03-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 011-002-000 |
2011-02-15 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2011-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |