IL HB1375 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0369
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0369
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that, in order to be considered a responsible bidder under the Code, a bidder must submit a signed affidavit stating that it will maintain an Illinois office as the primary place of employment for persons employed in the construction authorized by the contract. Effective immediately.
Title
PROCUREMENT-RESPONSIBLE BIDDER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0369 |
2011-08-15 | House | Effective Date August 15, 2011 |
2011-08-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-18 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 041-014-000 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2011 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-002-001 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Held in Executive |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2011-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 013-000-000 |
2011-02-14 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 30-22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |