IL HB1346 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides for the issuance of Soldier's Medal Plates license plates to persons who have earned the Soldier's Medal from the U.S. Armed Forces. Provides that the applicant shall pay an additional fee of $15 for original issuance of the plates, to be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund.
Title
VEH CD-SOLDIER'S MEDAL PLATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-10-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2011-05-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-14 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1346&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB1346.htm |