IL HB1274 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, for taxable years 2024 and thereafter, the maximum reduction under the senior citizens homestead exemption is $8,000 in all counties (currently, $8,000 in counties with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants and counties that are contiguous to a county of 3,000,000 or more inhabitants and $5,000 in all other counties). Provides that the maximum income limitation for the senior citizens assessment freeze homestead exemption is $75,000 (currently, $65,000). Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SENIOR HOMESTEAD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-08 | House | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-12-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2023-12-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2023-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2023-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2023-08-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2023-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2023-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2023-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1274&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1274.htm |