IL HB1272 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Banking Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Burke [D] | Rep. Arthur Turner [D] | Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-03-21 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |