IL HB1265 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0650
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0650
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the State Board of Education.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0650 |
2018-07-31 | House | Effective Date July 31, 2018 |
2018-07-31 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-001-001 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-021-001 |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-16 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-04-16 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.25j | Amended Code | Citation Text |