IL HB1252 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the School Code's construction.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-29 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-20 | Senate | Re-assigned to Education |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Re-assigned to Education |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-11-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-11-08 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 067-049-000 |
2017-11-02 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017 |
2017-11-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-11-02 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-07-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2017-07-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-07-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-07-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-07-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-07-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-07-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-07-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-07-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-07-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-07-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-07-03 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2017-07-03 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-07-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-07-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-06-29 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2017-06-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2017-06-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-05-17 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-05-17 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 010-008-000 |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-04-03 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 010-008-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Re-assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |