IL HB1227 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-06HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-07-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-07-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-06-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-06-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-06-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-06-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-06-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-06-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-06-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-06-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-06-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-06-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-06-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-06-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-06-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 004-003-000
2017-06-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee
2017-06-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-06-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-06-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-06-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-06-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-06-25HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-06-23HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-06-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-23HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6551-1-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback