IL HB1064 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a person who was under the age of 21 and is serving a sentence for first degree murder or a term of natural life imprisonment shall be eligible for parole review by the Prisoner Review Board after serving 40 years or more of his or her sentence or sentences.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIMINAL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 47 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-21SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
2021-05-20SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
2021-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
2021-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2021-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2021-05-05SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-05-04SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2021-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2021-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-047-000
2021-04-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-04-21HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-007-000
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-04-20HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-03-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 014-000-000
2021-03-02HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-02-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-17HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-2.5-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback