IL HB0989 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Business Corporation Act of 1983. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
BUSINESS-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 005-002-000 |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee |
2022-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2022-03-21 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2022-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2022-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-15 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2022-03-15 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022 |
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2021-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2021-03-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
805 | 5 | 1.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |