IL HB0983 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Government Debt Reform Act. Provides that determinations of sufficiency of enterprise revenues or revenue sources shall be conducted by the chief procurement officer for procurements of construction and construction-related services under the jurisdiction of the Capital Development Board. Provides that enterprise revenues shall be sufficient to pay 150% (instead of 100%) of the debt service on all outstanding revenue bonds payable from those enterprise revenues. Provides that a petition to initiate a backdoor referendum concerning the issuance of alternate bonds may be filed within 90 (instead of 30) days of publication of the authorizing ordinance and notice. Provides that it must be signed by 5% of the registered voters in the governmental unit or 500 of those registered voters, whichever is less. Provides that, if alternate bonds are payable from a combination of enterprise revenues and property taxes, and if, in any fiscal year of the governmental unit, the total amount of enterprise revenues collected exceeds the debt service payable on those bonds, then, within 90 days after the last day of the fiscal year, the surplus revenues shall be refunded to property owners within the governmental unit according to each property owner's pro rata share of property taxes paid in that fiscal year. Effective immediately.
Title
DEBT REFORM-ALT REVENUE BONDS
Sponsors
Rep. David McSweeney [R] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Dwight Kay [R] | Rep. Sandra Pihos [R] |
Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. Dan Duffy [R] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0203 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2013-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Cities & Villages Committee; 013-000-000 |
2013-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Cities & Villages Committee; 013-000-000 |
2013-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Cities & Villages Committee |
2013-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Cities & Villages Committee |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. David McSweeney |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. David McSweeney |
2013-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2013-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2013 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 011-000-000 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Reported Back To Local Government; |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Assignments Re-refers to Local Government; from Subcommittee on Special Issues |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government; Subcommittee on Special Issues (LG) |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (LG) |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Duffy |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-006-002 |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-14 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 014-002-000 |
2013-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2013-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
2013-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2013-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-28 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 350 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 500 | 10-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |