IL HB0901 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Requires the Illinois Student Assistance Commission to implement and administer a program, beginning with the 2020-2021 academic year, to award College Promise grants to Illinois residents seeking an associate degree from a public community college or a bachelor's degree from a public university. Provides that a College Promise grant shall be equal to the cost of tuition and mandatory fees at the public institution attended less all other student aid, subject to appropriation from the College Promise Fund; defines "student aid". Sets forth the terms and conditions of the program. Amends the State Finance Act to create the College Promise Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED-COLLEGE PROMISE
Sponsors
Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] | Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin [D] |
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-06-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | To Special Issues Subcommittee (HED) |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 947 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=901&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0901.htm |