IL HB0888 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
Pending: House Firearms and Firearm Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that the Department of State Police shall conduct a search of the purchasers' social media accounts available to the public to determine if there is any information that would disqualify the person from obtaining or require revocation of a currently valid Firearm Owner's Identification Card. Provides that each applicant for a Firearm Owner's Identification Card shall furnish to the Department of State Police a list of every social media account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOID-SOCIAL MEDIA ACCOUNTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2019-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
430653.1Amended CodeCitation Text
430654Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback