IL HB0866 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0451
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0451
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Day and Temporary Labor Services Act. Provides that, in a municipality with more than 1,000,000 inhabitants, a day and temporary labor service agency may not operate or transact business at a location that is within 1,000 feet of a school building or a building in which a Boys and Girls Club is located or real property comprising a school or a Boys and Girls Club. Exempts a day and temporary labor service agency that registered with the Department of Labor before January 1, 2008 and received an occupancy permit from the municipality for that location before January 1, 2008. Defines "school" as a public or private pre-school, elementary school, or secondary school. Contains a home rule preemption.
Title
DAY TEMP LABOR-LOCATION-SCHOOL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-14 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0451 | |
2009-08-14 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-14 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-19 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-19 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 18, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Do Pass Labor; 009-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Labor | |
2009-04-21 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather Steans | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | First Reading | |
2009-03-30 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-03-30 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-03-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-30 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-27 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 | |
2009-03-27 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-25 | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor Committee; 024-000-000 | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Labor Committee | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-10 | First Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Harry Osterman |