IL HB0861 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Domestic Violence Maintenance Task Force Act. Creates the Domestic Violence Maintenance Task Force to: research and examine maintenance award patterns in State domestic relations cases involving domestic violence; and develop recommendations to improve the safety and long-term economic security of victims of domestic violence. Includes provisions for membership, compensation, and meetings. Requires the Task Force to issue a preliminary report and a final report to the General Assembly and the Governor. Authorizes the Administrative Office of the Illinois Courts to: provide administrative support to the Task Force; and oversee the research project. Repeals the Act on January 1, 2025.
Title
IMDMA-MAINTENANCE-EXCEPTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-05-09 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-05-09 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 016-000-000 |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 016-000-000 |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-04-06 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2022-03-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2022-03-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harris |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Diane Pappas |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 005-000-000 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-01-25 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2021-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-12 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-03-10 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Civil Committee; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-02-10 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
750 | 5 | 502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 5 | 504 | Amended Code | Citation Text |